Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegates Aumann, Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Buckel, Carey, Cassilly, Chang, Ciliberti, Ghrist, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jameson, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Lisanti, Long, Malone, McComas, McDonough, McKay, Metzgar, Morgan, Patterson, Rey, Rose, Shoemaker, Szeliga, West, B. Wilson, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Making the crime of human trafficking in a case in which the victim of the crime is an adult a felony, rather than a misdemeanor; and making a conforming change.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0527
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0241 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM