Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
Sponsored by
Carroll County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Removing a reference to a specified public transportation provider in Carroll County from the definition of "local government" under the Local Government Tort Claims Act.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30
Text - Third - Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 32
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 31
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 56
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 58
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM