Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Portability
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Comptroller)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 111
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a person who files a Maryland estate tax return solely for the purpose of making a certain election to file the return within 2 years after the death of the decedent; clarifying the definition of "deceased spousal unused exclusion amount" for certain purposes of law governing the calculation of the Maryland estate tax; authorizing the Comptroller to examine certain estate tax returns for certain purposes; prohibiting an additional assessment of estate tax if a certain period of limitation has expired; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Estate Tax - Portability
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {915761/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Estate Tax - Portability
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 111
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Estate Tax - Portability
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Estate Tax - Portability
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {915761/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Estate Tax - Portability
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 111
Text - Chapter - Maryland Estate Tax - Portability
(   7-305, 7-306, 7-309 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page