Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Kittleman, and Moon
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act; establishing the purposes of the Act; establishing rights and obligations of specified intended parents who use gamete or embryo donors to conceive a child through collaborative reproduction; establishing specified rights of a child conceived through collaborative reproduction; establishing that a gamete or an embryo donor is not a parent of a child conceived through collaborative reproduction under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0273
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0236 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/31/2015 1/30/2015 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-901 through 5-914 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM