Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Limited Lines - Travel Insurance
Sponsored by
Delegate Rudolph
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified provisions of law relating to limited lines insurance for transportation tickets to relate instead to limited lines travel insurance; authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to issue a limited lines license to an individual or a business entity to sell travel insurance; authorizing a travel retailer to offer and disseminate travel insurance under specified circumstances under the direction of a limited lines travel insurance producer; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0079
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {953991/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments {953991/1 Report Adopted 21
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 21
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 23
Senate 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 First Reading Finance 22
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 53
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 10-122, 10-130 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM