Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
End Ineffective Business Subsidies Act of 2020
Sponsored by
Delegates Palakovich Carr, Acevero, Barron, Boyce, Carr, Charkoudian, Cullison, Hettleman, Ivey, Korman, Lehman, R. Lewis, Moon, Mosby, Pena-Melnyk, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Wilkins, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Secretary of Commerce from designating or expanding certain enterprise zones and focus areas on or after June 1, 2020; providing for the termination of the One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credit Program on January 1, 2022; applying the Opportunity Zone Enhancement Program to taxable years 2019 through 2021; prohibiting the Department of Commerce from issuing tax credit certificates to certain investors in certain biotechnology companies on or after January 1, 2022; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - End Ineffective Business Subsidies Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - End Ineffective Business Subsidies Act of 2020
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 8:26 AM