Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Improving Access to Voting
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Reznik, Barve, Bobo, Carr, Clagett, Davis, Dumais, Frick, Guzzone, Hucker, Lafferty, Luedtke, McHale, Mitchell, Rosenberg, Simmons, Tarrant, M. Washington, Howard, and Cardin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an individual who applies to register to vote or update an existing voter registration online to provide specified information; providing an exception to the voter registration deadline to allow an individual to register to vote or update an existing voter registration address and vote during early voting; requiring proof of residency to register or update an existing voter registration address during early voting; specifying methods of requesting an absentee ballot, including through an accessible online application; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0279
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013, January 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/21/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {765560/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {523829/1 Rejected (52-76)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {563722/1 Rejected (40-93)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {965669/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {483128/1 Rejected (44-93)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-43)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {454231/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (36-11)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-40)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2013 1/21/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {765560/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {523829/1 Rejected (52-76) 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {563722/1 Rejected (40-93) 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Floor Committee Amendment {965669/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Special Order until later today (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {483128/1 Rejected (44-93) 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (92-43) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 51
Senate 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {454231/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (36-11) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (99-40) 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301.1, 16-201, 3-204.1, 3-302, 3-305, 9-305, 9-306, 9-308.1, 9-310 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM