Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Cardin, Hixson, Howard, Kaiser, Luedtke, A. Miller, Stukes, F. Turner, and Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Attorney General to institute an action in a circuit court for injunctive relief to prohibit a person from engaging in or continuing to engage in specified violations of election law; providing that injunctive relief may be granted under the Act only to prevent specified violations of election law from affecting a pending election; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0220 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/17/2014 Text - First - Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2014
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-1003, 16-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM