Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Domestic Violence - Additional Relief
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Hettleman, Jalisi, Kittleman, McComas, Moon, Morales, Rosenberg, Smith, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, B. Wilson, and Glass
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the relief that may be awarded in a final protective order to include any other relief that a judge determines is necessary to protect a person eligible for relief from abuse.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0269
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {112414/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {548174/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 1/30/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments {112414/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments {548174/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 61
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM