Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Deferred Retirement Option Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Chang, Anderton, Buckel, Haynes, Jackson, McCray, McKay, Otto, Sophocleus, B. Wilson, Wivell, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Deferred Retirement Option Program for members in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System who have at least 20 years and less than 25 years of eligibility service; requiring the State Retirement Agency to request, on or before July 1, 2017, specified documentation from the Internal Revenue Service; and making the Act subject to a specified contingency.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0147
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1545 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 4 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Deferred Retirement Option Program
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM