Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsored by
Delegates Jacobs, Arentz, and Ghrist
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a judge of the Orphans' Court for Kent County shall receive a salary set by the Kent County Commissioners; establishing that each judge shall receive an allowance for travel expenses in accordance with the county budget; requiring the County Commissioners to pay the travel allowance quarterly; and applying the Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0173
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 26
Text - Third - Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 28
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 29
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 54
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807
Text - Chapter - Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM