Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Notice of Eligibility - Lead Registry and Code Compliance
Sponsored by
Delegate Long
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to include with a required notice to a homeowner about the homestead property tax credit certain information regarding a homeowner's obligation to register residential rental property constructed before 1978 with the Maryland Department of the Environment and to comply with State and local building and housing codes for rental property.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1055 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Notice of Eligibility - Lead Registry and Code Compliance
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page