Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Beidle, Bromwell, Carey, Chang, Lisanti, Sample-Hughes, Sophocleus, Afzali, D. Barnes, Buckel, Ebersole, Fennell, Hornberger, C. Howard, Jackson, Kaiser, Long, Luedtke, Metzgar, Patterson, Platt, Reilly, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Tarlau, Turner, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax under specified circumstances for specified retirement income attributable to a resident's employment as a law enforcement officer or the individual's service as fire, rescue, or emergency services personnel; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1166
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {605069/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Special Order until 03/23 (Delegate Adams) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Adams) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Adams) {473929/1 Rejected (57-80)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Special Order until 03/24 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {513925/1 Rejected (47-84)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Favorable with Amendments {605069/1 Report Adopted 52
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Special Order until 03/23 (Delegate Adams) Adopted 52
House 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Special Order until later today (Delegate Adams) Adopted 53
House 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Adams) {473929/1 Rejected (57-80) 53
House 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Special Order until 03/24 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 53
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {513925/1 Rejected (47-84) 54
House 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
House 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 55
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 53
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM