Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts – Improperly Summoning a Police Officer – Civil Liability
Sponsored by
Delegate Charles
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain civil action to be brought against a person who knowingly summons a police officer with the intent to infringe on the person's constitutional rights, unlawfully discriminate against the person, cause the person to feel harassed or humiliated or to be expelled from a certain place, or damage a person's reputation or certain other interests; specifying certain types of damages that a certain person is entitled to recover; and providing that the Act does not restrict certain legal remedies.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0363
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1115 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/16/2020
Legislative Date
9/16/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts – Improperly Summoning a Police Officer – Civil Liability
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 9/16/2020 9/16/2020 Pre-filed
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Courts – Improperly Summoning a Police Officer – Civil Liability
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 1:00 PM