Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Child Care Products Containing Flame-Retardant Chemicals - TDCPP - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Hubbard, Bromwell, Cullison, A. Kelly, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Tarrant, and V. Turner
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from importing, selling, or offering for sale specified child care products containing specified flame-retardant chemicals; authorizing the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to suspend implementation of specified provisions of the Act if the Secretary makes a specified determination; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt specified regulations on or before January 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {576881/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Favorable with Amendments {576881/1 Report Adopted 31
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
House 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 33
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 First Reading Finance 32
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM