Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Interstate Compact on Washington Area Professional Football Team Franchise Facility Incentives
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon and Kittleman
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Interstate Compact on Washington Area Professional Football Team Franchise Facility Incentives; prohibiting a party state, a local jurisdiction in a party state, or a certain authority or corporation from providing financing or public incentives for the construction of facilities for the Washington area professional football team except under certain circumstances or leasing or donating land to the Washington area professional football team or an entity associated with the team; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1049 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Contingency - on adoption of an interstate compact
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Interstate Compact on Washington Area Professional Football Team Franchise Facility Incentives
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-401, 14-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM