Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Farm Breweries and Micro-Breweries
Sponsored by
Delegates Schulz, Afzali, Barkley, Clagett, Feldman, Hershey, Hogan, Hough, Jacobs, McDermott, W. Miller, Olszewski, Otto, Ready, and Smigiel
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding the holder of a Class 7 micro-brewery license to the list of licensees with whom a holder of a Class 8 farm brewery license may contract to brew and bottle beer from ingredients produced on the licensed farm; authorizing the Comptroller to issue in Howard County one Class 8 farm brewery license to a person that holds not more than two Class B beer, wine and liquor licenses; and making stylistic changes.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/22/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/22/2013
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {853390/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/22/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/22/2013 1/22/2013 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable with Amendments {853390/1 Report Adopted 48A
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
Senate 3/21/2013 3/21/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2013 3/22/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/22/2013 3/22/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-104, 2-208, 2-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM