Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings Accounts
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Angel, D. Barnes, Ebersole, Fennell, Hill, C. Howard, Korman, Luedtke, Queen, Tarlau, Turner, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for contributions to a specified first-time homebuyer savings account during a taxable year and specified earnings on the account; providing that an account holder may claim the subtraction modification under specified circumstances; providing that transfers of money to or from the account are subject to specified requirements and limitations; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings Accounts
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM