Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Impallaria and Jackson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or of a municipal corporation to grant a property tax credit for a dwelling owned by the surviving spouse or cohabitant of a specified fallen law enforcement officer or rescue worker; increasing from 2 to 10 years the time within which specified persons must have acquired specified residential property in order to qualify for a specified property tax credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2017; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {759236/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Alteration
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Alteration
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {759236/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Alterations
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Alterations
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page