Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Commissioner's Duties - Staffing Report
Sponsored by
Delegates McKay, Anderton, Beitzel, Buckel, Chang, Gutierrez, Haynes, Jackson, Krebs, McConkey, McCray, Parrott, Sophocleus, B. Wilson, Wivell, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 829
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Correction to submit a security and staffing report to the Secretary of Public Safety, the Governor, and the General Assembly on or before October 31, 2017, and on or before October 31 in every odd-numbered year thereafter; requiring the report to be based on a joint survey conducted by the administration of the Division of Correction and the exclusive collective bargaining representative of the employees; requiring the report to include specified information; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Commissioner's Duties - Staffing Report
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Commissioner's Duties - Staffing Report
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 829
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Correctional Services - Commissioner's Duties - Staffing Report
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Correctional Services - Commissioner's Duties - Staffing Report
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Commissioner's Duties - Staffing Report
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Finance 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 829
Text - Chapter - Correctional Services - Commissioner's Duties - Staffing Report
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page