Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Disclosure of Medical Records - Guardian Ad Litem - Victims of Crime or Delinquent Acts
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, West, Fennell, and Hettleman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a health care provider to disclose a medical record without specified authorization to a guardian ad litem appointed by a court to protect specified interests of a minor or a disabled or elderly individual who is a specified victim, for a specified purpose and use in specified court proceedings; authorizing a specified guardian ad litem to redisclose a specified record under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0666
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Disclosure of Medical Records - Guardian Ad Litem - Victims of Crime or Delinquent Acts
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 36
Text - Third - Disclosure of Medical Records - Guardian Ad Litem - Victims of Crime or Delinquent Acts
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 38
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Finance 37
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 56
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Text - Chapter - Disclosure of Medical Records - Guardian Ad Litem - Victims of Crime or Delinquent Acts
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-302, 4-304, 4-306 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:31 AM