Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Health and Safety Standards for Rental Housing in Prince George's County PG 410-18
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Health and Safety Standards for Rental Housing in Prince George's County; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding health and safety standards for rental housing in Prince George's County; requiring the Task Force to submit an interim report by September 30, 2018, and a final report by January 31, 2019, to the members of the Prince George's County delegation to the General Assembly; terminating the Act after June 30, 2019; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Task Force to Study Health and Safety Standards for Rental Housing in Prince George's County PG 410-18
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM