Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Campaign Finance - Making a Contribution During General Assembly Session - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg and Luedtke
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from directly or indirectly making a specified contribution during a regular session of the General Assembly; and providing that the prohibition applies only to a person who has received notice of the prohibition on specified contributions during a regular session of the General Assembly from a specified official or a person acting on behalf of a specified official.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Campaign Finance - Making a Contribution During General Assembly Session - Prohibition
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
(   13-235 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page