Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Kelly, Barkley, Bates, Beitzel, Boteler, Bromwell, Cluster, Conway, Costa, DeBoy, Donoghue, Eckardt, Elliott, Fisher, Haddaway-Riccio, Impallaria, Jacobs, James, Kach, Kipke, Krebs, Malone, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, McDonough, McMillan, W. Miller, Minnick, Myers, Norman, O'Donnell, Olszewski, Otto, Ready, Rudolph, Schulz, Serafini, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Szeliga, Weir, Wilson, and Wood
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person who is convicted of first degree murder may be sentenced to death under specified circumstances; providing that the murder of a law enforcement officer or a correctional officer under specified circumstances are aggravating circumstances that the court or jury must consider in making a determination as to the imposition of the death penalty; establishing procedures for the imposition of the death penalty; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-901 through 3-909, 4-101, 4-305, 6-112, 7-301 )
(   12-307, 3-8A-03, 3-8A-06, 8-404, 8-420, 9-204 )
(   11-404, 3-105, 3-106, 3-107, 4-204, 5-101, 7-101, 7-103, 7-107, 7-201 through 7-204, 8-108 )
(   14-101, 2-201, 2-202, 2-301, 2-303, 2-304, 2-305, 2-401 )
(   16-812 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM