Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Minority Business Enterprises - Transitioning From Subcontractors to Prime Contractors - Study and Report
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Robinson, Glenn, C. Howard, Patterson, Proctor, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor's Office of Minority Affairs and the Office of Minority Business Enterprise in the Department of Transportation to conduct a specified study with specified parties on how the State can assist minority business enterprises in transitioning from subcontractors to prime contractors; requiring the Governor's Office of Minority Affairs and the Office of Minority Business Enterprise to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2017; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0547 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 3/01/2016 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM