Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Active Military, Former Prisoners of War, Recipients of the Purple Heart Award, and Disabled Veterans
Sponsored by
Delegate Carey
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that the Department of Natural Resources submit certain reports to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2019; and repealing the termination provisions for certain provisions of law relating to the issuance of complimentary or discounted hunting and fishing licenses to certain military personnel, former prisoners of war, recipients of the Purple Heart Award, and disabled veterans.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0025
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {950413/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Active Military, Former Prisoners of War, Recipients of the Purple Heart Award, and Disabled Veterans
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {950413/1 Adopted 35
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Active Military, Former Prisoners of War, Recipients of the Purple Heart Award, and Disabled Veterans
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 38
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:23 AM