Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2021)
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Feldmark, Ebersole, Kerr, Johnson, Terrasa, R. Lewis, and Bagnall
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of General Services to establish and update, every five years, certain standards for State buildings to conserve energy and minimize adverse impacts on birds; requiring the Department to reduce the lighting of existing State buildings in a certain manner; requiring the Maryland Green Building Council to include certain standards in any requirements that the Council establishes for participation in a higher performance building program; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0192 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/22/2020
Legislative Date
9/22/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/22/2020 9/22/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Text - First - Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2021)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/12/2021 11:49 AM