Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - License Renewal
Sponsored by
Delegates Oaks, Carter, and Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore City Board of Liquor License Commissioners to consider specified factors in determining whether to grant an application for a license renewal when a protest against the renewal is filed; requiring the Board to deny an application for renewal if the Board makes a specified finding; and requiring the Board to make its findings in writing and available to the public.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0331
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/22/2013
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/22/2013 1/22/2013 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM