Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing - Workforce Housing Grant Program - Mandatory Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate Lafferty
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to appropriate at least $4,000,000 for each of fiscal years 2019, 2020, 2021, 2022, and 2023 to the Workforce Housing Fund to be restricted to projects in designated sustainable communities; and adding the Workforce Housing Grant Program to a specified list of programs that are required to give State funding priority to a sustainable community.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Housing - Workforce Housing Grant Program - Mandatory Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Housing - Workforce Housing Grant Program - Mandatory Funding
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-1801, 4-1802, 4-506, 6-201, 6-212 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM