Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George’s County – Vehicle Laws – Authority to Tow Vehicles PG 418–18
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 777
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the governing body of Prince George's County and the police department in Prince George's County from using other persons, equipment, or facilities for removing, preserving, and storing vehicles under State and local law except under certain circumstances; and altering the definition of "police department" to include an appropriate agency or department designated by the County Executive of Prince George's County for purposes of provisions relating to the towing of abandoned vehicles in Prince George's County.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {328274/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 777
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Prince George's County - Vehicle Laws - Authority to Tow Abandoned Vehicles PG 418-18
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Vehicle Laws - Authority to Tow Abandoned Vehicles PG 418-18
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48B
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {328274/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 65
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Prince George’s County – Vehicle Laws – Authority to Tow Vehicles PG 418–18
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 777
Text - Chapter - Prince George’s County – Vehicle Laws – Authority to Tow Vehicles PG 418–18
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-303.1, 25-115, 25-201, 25-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM