Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting and Conference Expenses
Sponsored by
Delegates C. Howard, D. Barnes, Davis, Fennell, Frush, Glenn, Proctor, B. Robinson, Vaughn, Walker, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including as an allowable expenditure of funds from a campaign account under the State election law a disbursement to pay for travel, lodging, meals, and registration expenses associated with attendance of an office holder or a candidate at meetings or conferences focused on legislative issues, process, or public policy analysis pertinent to the office the elected official holds or that the candidate seeks.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0271
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0562 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-14)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (120-14) 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM