Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County Police Officers - Body-Worn Cameras
Sponsored by
Delegates Sydnor, Bromwell, Brooks, and Jalisi
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring, on or before July 1, 2016, the Baltimore County Police Department to adopt policies and procedures for the use of body-worn cameras consistent with specified policies developed by the Maryland Police Training Commission and to issue body-worn cameras to law enforcement officers to use while on duty.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-511, 3-511.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM