Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Sales of Residential Real Property - Community Amenities - Advertising PG 412-18
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 778
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering requirements relating to advertising for the sale of residential real property in a community development in Prince George's County that will include a certain community amenity; requiring a copy of any recreational facilities agreement recorded with the Prince George's County Planning Department to be made available to prospective purchasers in a certain location; requiring certain information to be displayed in a certain manner in a certain office of a community development; and applying the Act prospectively.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {273195/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 778
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Prince George's County - Sales of Residential Real Property - Community Amenities - Advertising PG 412-18
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments {273195/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Sales of Residential Real Property - Community Amenities - Advertising PG 412-18
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 778
Text - Chapter - Prince George's County - Sales of Residential Real Property - Community Amenities - Advertising PG 412-18
(   10-710 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page