Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Property Managers - Registration
Sponsored by
Delegate Rogers
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a person who provides property management services to be registered as a property manager by the State Real Estate Commission before practicing in the State; prohibiting the providing of, attempting to provide, or offering to provide property management services unless registered with the Commission as a property manager; subjecting violators of this prohibition to a civil fine of not more than $1,000; requiring certain property managers to be covered by a certain surety bond; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0073
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0929 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Real Estate Commission - Property Managers - Registration
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - State Real Estate Commission - Property Managers - Registration
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-3B-01 through 17-3B-08 )
Last Updated: 1/15/2021 2:52 PM