Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement - Federal Surplus Program - Equipment Acquisition
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Atterbeary, Korman, Proctor, Sanchez, and Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain law enforcement agencies to post notice of the acquisition of certain equipment from a federal military surplus program within 14 days after the agency acquires the equipment from a surplus program; and requiring that, on or before December 31 each year, a law enforcement agency that has received equipment from a surplus program report the receipt of the equipment to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0661
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Law Enforcement - Federal Surplus Program - Equipment Acquisition
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {422914/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Law Enforcement - Federal Surplus Program - Equipment Acquisition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-33)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
29
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Law Enforcement - Federal Surplus Program - Equipment Acquisition
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {422914/1 Adopted 26
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26
Text - Third - Law Enforcement - Federal Surplus Program - Equipment Acquisition
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (103-33) 28
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 29
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM