Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law authorizing an application for a search warrant to contain a request authorizing the executing law enforcement officer to enter certain premises or a thing to be searched without giving notice of the officer's authority or purpose under certain circumstances; authorizing an application for a search warrant to contain a request to authorize a law enforcement officer to enter certain premises or a thing to be searched during the time period between sunset and sunrise under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Requirements
House 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/22/2021 9:56 AM