Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Registration and Voting at Early Voting Centers
Sponsored by
Delegates Cardin, Hixson, Ivey, Luedtke, Reznik, Rosenberg, and Summers
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an individual to apply to register to vote at specified early voting centers on a day designated for voting before election day by completing a voter registration application and providing specified proof of residency; requiring that an individual who satisfies specified requirements for registration at an early voting center be allowed to vote a provisional ballot; requiring that provisional ballots cast under the Act be separated and held apart from other provisional ballots cast at an early voting center; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0519
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-308, 10-310, 11-303, 3-201, 3-204.2, 3-302, 9-404, 9-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM