Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Simonaire, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, West, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a designee of the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to administer the Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund; requiring the Department of Veterans Affairs to publish on its website the names of certain donors to the Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund who have authorized the Department to publish their names; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0053
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {716588/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of Program
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {716588/1 Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of Program
House 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Text - Chapter - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of Program
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page