Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Unauthorized Use of Rented Motor Vehicle - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Arora, Aumann, Barnes, Branch, Braveboy, Burns, Cane, Carr, Carter, Cluster, Conaway, Conway, Cullison, Dumais, Glass, Glenn, Guzzone, Harper, Haynes, Hough, Hucker, A. Kelly, K. Kelly, Lafferty, Lee, Luedtke, McDonough, McHale, McIntosh, Mizeur, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Otto, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Ready, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Simmons, Smigiel, Sophocleus, Stukes, Szeliga, Tarrant, F. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Vitale, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 591
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law that prohibits a person who rents a motor vehicle under a specified agreement from permitting another person to drive the vehicle; repealing a provision of law specifying that if a person rents a motor vehicle under a specified agreement, no other person may drive the vehicle without the consent of the lessor or the agent of the lessor; and repealing a specified penalty.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (109-21)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-4)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 591
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 35
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (109-21) 37
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 36
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (43-4) 56
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 591
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-106, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM