Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Student Data Privacy Council
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Bartlett, Boyce, Cain, Carey, Cullison, Ebersole, Hettleman, Howard, Ivey, Jones, Korman, Krimm, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Love, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Smith, Stewart, C. Watson, K. Young, Walker, D. Barnes, Buckel, Feldmark, Guyton, Hornberger, Long, Mosby, Reilly, Rose, Shoemaker, Turner, Washington, and Wilkins
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Student Data Privacy Council to study the development and implementation of the Student Data Privacy Act of 2015 and review similar laws and best practices in other states and appropriate technologies; specifying the membership of the Council; requiring the Council to report its recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2020, regarding potential statutory and regulatory changes to the Student Data Privacy Act; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0430 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Student Data Privacy Council
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {375266/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Student Data Privacy Council
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {154835/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Education - Student Data Privacy Council
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Education - Student Data Privacy Council
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Student Data Privacy Council
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {375266/1 Adopted 25
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Education - Student Data Privacy Council
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 27
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 27
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {154835/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 57
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 57
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education - Student Data Privacy Council
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Text - Chapter - Education - Student Data Privacy Council
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM