Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Surgical Birth Rate - Study
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Arikan, Bagnall, Bhandari, Boteler, Cain, Cox, Cullison, Kelly, Kerr, Lehman, R. Lewis, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission, in consultation with the Maternal and Child Health Bureau, the Vital Statistics Administration, and interested stakeholders, to conduct a study regarding the surgical birth rate in the State; requiring the Commission to examine the rate of complications, increased health care costs and global research programs related to surgical births; requiring the Commission to report its recommendations to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before November 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0445
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Health Care Commission - Surgical Birth Rate - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Health Care Commission - Surgical Birth Rate - Study
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM