Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsored by
Delegates McMillan and O'Donnell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Changing the interest rate paid on a security deposit at the end of a tenancy under a residential lease when an evicted or ejected tenant makes a timely written demand for return of the security deposit; altering the annual interest rate paid by a mobile home park owner on a security deposit at the end of a tenancy; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to maintain on its Web site a specified list or calculator; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0345
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0045 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {660517/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/20/2014 1/20/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {660517/1 Report Adopted 25
House 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (120-0) 27
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 26
Senate 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-203, 8A-1001 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM