Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominiums - Responsibility for Property Insurance Deductibles
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering, in the case of a council of unit owners' responsibility to repair or replace damage to certain portions of a condominium, the circumstances under which the council of unit owners' property insurance deductible is a common expense; increasing the maximum amount of the council of unit owners' property insurance deductible for which a unit owner is responsible; and applying the Act to all policies of property and casualty insurance issued, delivered, or renewed in the State to a condominium council of unit owners; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Condominiums - Responsibility for Property Insurance Deductibles
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {490314/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Condominiums - Responsibility for Property Insurance Deductibles
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Condominiums - Responsibility for Property Insurance Deductibles
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {490314/1 Adopted 35
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Condominiums - Responsibility for Property Insurance Deductibles
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 37
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 37
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-114 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM