Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Right to Opt Out of Third-Party Disclosure
Sponsored by
Delegates C. Watson and Carey
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing consumers to demand that a business not disclose the consumer's personal information to third parties and to exercise the right to opt out of third-party disclosure through a certain setting, including a browser setting, browser extension, or global device setting; prohibiting a business from disclosing the personal information of a consumer to a third party if the business has certain knowledge of or willfully disregards the fact the consumer is under the age of 18; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Right to Opt Out of Third-Party Disclosure
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Consumer Protection - Right to Opt Out of Third-Party Disclosure
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-301, 14-4201 through 14-4203 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:41 PM