Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Priority of Liens
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart, Lehman, Acevero, B. Barnes, Barron, Boyce, Charkoudian, W. Fisher, Hill, Ivey, R. Lewis, Lopez, Love, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Queen, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Terrasa, Valentino-Smith, Wells, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, in the case of a certain priority of a condominium's liens in a foreclosure of a mortgage or deed of trust on a condominium unit, the maximum number of months from 4 to 6 of certain unpaid regular assessments of which the condominium's liens shall consist; authorizing a condominium's liens to include certain costs or sums under certain circumstances; repealing the monetary cap for a condominium's liens under certain circumstances; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0374
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Priority of Liens
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Priority of Liens
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM