Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB0251


CH0136

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Obsolete Reemployment Provisions
Sponsored by
Delegate M. Jackson (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 136
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Updating and altering certain obsolete provisions relating to the reemployment of certain teachers and principals who are retirees of the Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0236
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {314461/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 136
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Obsolete Reemployment Provisions
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {314461/1 Adopted 25
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Obsolete Reemployment Provisions
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 27
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 28
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 9:30 a.m.
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 136
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:11 PM