Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Development Plan - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates Smigiel, Afzali, Boteler, Eckardt, Fisher, Haddaway-Riccio, Jacobs, Krebs, McComas, McDermott, W. Miller, Myers, Otto, Parrott, and Stocksdale
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that the Department of Planning prepare and revise specified plans for the development of the State for specified purposes and based on specified studies; repealing a requirement that the Department seek comments from and consult with specified local governments and seek the cooperation and advice of specified persons when preparing and revising a specified Plan; repealing a provision stating that the Plan shall embody specified policy recommendations of the Department; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0654 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-508 )
(   5-307, 5-402, 5-507, 5-601 through 5-606, 5-608 through 5-615, 5-706 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM