Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor and Wine
Sponsored by
Delegate Barkley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding a definition of "liquor" to the Alcoholic Beverages Article; and adding an alcohol content limitation on wine that is sold under a beer and wine license in specified jurisdictions.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor and Wine
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor and Wine
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor and Wine
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor and Wine
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor and Wine
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 42
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 56
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor and Wine
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 13-102, 13-801, 13-801 through 13-804, 15-102, 15-801, 15-801 through 15-805, 16-102, 16-801, 16-801 through 16-804, 17-102, 17-801, 17-801 through 17-804, 19-102, 19-801, 19-801 through 19-804, 20-102, 20-801, 20-801 through 20-804, 21-102, 21-801, 21-801 through 21-805, 22-102, 22-801, 22-801 through 22-807, 22-807.1, 22-808, 24-102, 24-801, 24-801 through 24-804, 25-102, 25-801, 25-801 through 25-805, 27-102, 27-801, 27-801 through 27-804, 28-102, 28-801, 28-801 through 28-804, 29-102, 29-801, 29-801 through 29-804, 30-102, 30-801, 30-801 through 30-804, 32-102, 32-801, 32-801 through 32-804, 33-102, 33-801, 33-801 through 33-804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM