Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Allegany County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsored by
Allegany County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding Allegany County to the provisions of law relating to the Cecil County, Garrett County, and St. Mary's County Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Second Reading Passed 35
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 35
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM