Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais and Kramer
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a State or local law enforcement agency, on process issued by a court of competent jurisdiction, to seize specified property used or intended for use in connection with a violation of a specified criminal statute relating to exploitation of vulnerable adults; specifying property that is subject to forfeiture; authorizing the seizure of specified property with or without a warrant under specified circumstances; requiring the seizing authority that seizes money to take specified actions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/03/2015 2/03/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-601 through 13-636 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM